MO HB90 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a political subdivision from adopting an ordinance, rule, or code that would require mandatory installation of a sprinkler system in new residential construction
Title
Prohibits a political subdivision from adopting an ordinance, rule, or code that would require mandatory installation of a sprinkler system in new residential construction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-05 | Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB90&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0090I.htm |