MO HB854 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the expiration date for provisions relating to the Missouri Qualified Fuel Ethanol Producer Incentive Fund and authorizes a tax credit for the purchase a of qualified alternative fuel vehicle
Title
Repeals the expiration date for provisions relating to the Missouri Qualified Fuel Ethanol Producer Incentive Fund and authorizes a tax credit for the purchase a of qualified alternative fuel vehicle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - HB 854 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 107 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-04-29 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED |
2015-04-29 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H) |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |