MO HB854 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a dentist to delegate the tasks of placement of pit or fissure sealants and application of topical fluoride to dental assistants under his or her direct supervision
Title
Allows a dentist to delegate the tasks of placement of pit or fissure sealants and application of topical fluoride to dental assistants under his or her direct supervision
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB854&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0854I.htm |