MO HB848 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Daylight Saving as New Standard Time Pact"
Title
Establishes the "Daylight Saving as New Standard Time Pact"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: HB 848 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 126 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 4, 9:00 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 27, 9:00 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics(S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 6 |
2021-04-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-14 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-04-14 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-14 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-14 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-31 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2021-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |