MO HB817 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that all state properties that currently have a flagpole shall fly the POW/MIA flag
Title
Specifies that all state properties that currently have a flagpole shall fly the POW/MIA flag
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |