MO HB779 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends fees for programs within the Department of Natural Resources
Title
Extends fees for programs within the Department of Natural Resources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - House: HB 779 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 122 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 9, 2023, 9:30 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2023-05-04 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - AMENDED: Tuesday, April 25, 2023, 9:30 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 25, 2023, 2:00 p.m, Senate Lounge |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S) |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 122 NOES: 32 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-05 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2023-03-29 | House | Perfected (H) |
2023-03-29 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2023-03-29 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-03-29 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-03-27 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2023-03-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2023-01-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |