MO HB769 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-31 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-31 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to proxy voting and fiduciary investment duties for certain public employee retirement and pension systems
Title
Modifies provisions related to proxy voting and fiduciary investment duties for certain public employee retirement and pension systems
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Owen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-01-19 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2023-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |