MO HB766 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-13 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-13 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to background checks for employees and others associated with marijuana facilities
Title
Creates provisions relating to background checks for employees and others associated with marijuana facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - House: HB 766 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2023-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 3 |
2023-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-03-27 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Perfected (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-03-22 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-03-21 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2023-03-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 21 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2023-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |