MO HB762 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to reverse keyword and reverse location searches
Title
Establishes provisions relating to reverse keyword and reverse location searches
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Baker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H) |
2023-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |