MO HB728 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utility Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utility Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the membership of the Public Service Commission
Title
Changes the laws regarding the membership of the Public Service Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Don Rone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred: Utility Infrastructure(H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB728&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0728I.PDF |