MO HB689 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a tax credit for certain physicians providing preceptorships
Title
Authorizes a tax credit for certain physicians providing preceptorships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: HB 689 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 146 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 4, 12 noon or upon morning recess, Senate Lounge |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 27, 12 noon or upon morning recess, Senate Lounge |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Economic Development(S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-04-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2021-04-13 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-13 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 |
2021-03-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |