MO HB654 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes provisions relating to credentialing procedure.
Title
Changes provisions relating to credentialing procedure.
Sponsors
Rep. James Neely [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |