MO HB622 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes exemptions from clean water law permitting requirements
Title
Establishes exemptions from clean water law permitting requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Knight [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2 |
2023-03-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred: Rural Community Development(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |