MO HB590 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all public officials to maintain a direct phone number and email address for the purposes of constituent contact
Title
Requires all public officials to maintain a direct phone number and email address for the purposes of constituent contact
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Houx [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-28 | House | Prefiled (H) |