MO HB587 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the bonding requirement for the treasurer of a seven-director school district
Title
Modifies the bonding requirement for the treasurer of a seven-director school district
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - House: HB 587 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass Consent |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 12, 2017, 1:50pm, Bingham Conference Room |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 11, 2017, 8:02am, Senate Lounge |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 4, 2017, 8:32am, Senate Lounge |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Insurance and Banking(S) |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-03-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 155 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 2 |
2017-03-13 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-07 | House | Perfected (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-03-07 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2017-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |