MO HB583 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires an audit of all state departments every four years
Title
Requires an audit of all state departments every four years
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Riggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House: HB 583 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 8, 2021, 8:15am, SCR 1 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 153 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-08 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-22 | House | Prefiled (H) |