MO HB55 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a state and local sales and use tax exemption for over-the-counter or nonprescription drugs which are prescribed by a practitioner and certain medical equipment, supplies, or devices
Title
Authorizes a state and local sales and use tax exemption for over-the-counter or nonprescription drugs which are prescribed by a practitioner and certain medical equipment, supplies, or devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-01-27 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-05 | Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB55&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0055I.htm |