MO HB531 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires liquid nicotine products to be sold in child-safe packaging
Title
Requires liquid nicotine products to be sold in child-safe packaging
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - HB 531 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-07-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 14, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment(S) |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |