MO HB530 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to criminal offenses
Title
Modifies provisions relating to criminal offenses
Sponsors
Rep. David Evans [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House: HB 530 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 29, 8:15 a.m., SCR 1 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 12, 2021, 1:30pm, SCR 1 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-03-29 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 Adopted |
2021-03-23 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-23 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-15 | House | Prefiled (H) |