MO HB526 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to traffic violations
Title
Modifies provisions relating to traffic violations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-15 | House | Prefiled (H) |