MO HB519 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S)
Pending: Senate Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S)
Pending: Senate Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to motor fuel tax exemption
Title
Modifies provisions relating to motor fuel tax exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Don Mayhew [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - House: HB 519 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 108 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: HB 519 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 100 N: 40 NV: 18 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House: HB 519 (HA 2) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: HB 519 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 100 N: 40 NV: 18 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House: HB 519 (HA 2) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S) |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 100 NOES: 40 PRESENT: 18 |
2023-04-04 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-04-03 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2023-03-27 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 and HA 4, adopted. |
2023-03-27 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-03-27 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred: Transportation Accountability(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-28 | House | Prefiled (H) |