MO HB42 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-08 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-08 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an electrical corporation to pay a surcharge of one-tenth of one cent per kilowatt hour on all nuclear energy produced in the state and sold out of its service territory
Title
Requires an electrical corporation to pay a surcharge of one-tenth of one cent per kilowatt hour on all nuclear energy produced in the state and sold out of its service territory
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Utilities (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-05 | Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB42&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0042I.htm |