MO HB400 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the imposition of a transient guest tax
Title
Changes the laws regarding the imposition of a transient guest tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2011-02-03 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB400&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0400I.htm |