MO HB397 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for water and sewer infrastructure
Title
Modifies provisions for water and sewer infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-10 | House | Prefiled (H) |