MO HB395 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Ways and Means(H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Ways and Means(H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a waiver for certain property taxes if paid within thirty days of the due date.
Title
Authorizes a waiver for certain property taxes if paid within thirty days of the due date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB395&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1137H.01I.pdf |