MO HB374 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding judicial procedures
Title
Changes the laws regarding judicial procedures
Sponsors
Rep. Stanley Cox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-03 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2013-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 33 |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 33 |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2013-05-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 9 |
2013-05-17 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 9 |
2013-05-15 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2013-05-15 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES ELMER, COX, COLONA |
2013-05-15 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS DIXON, SCHMITT, EMERY, JUSTUS, KEAVENY |
2013-05-15 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2013-05-14 | House | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS AS AMENDED |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3 ADOPTED AYES: 33 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 13, 2013, 1:30 PM, SCR 2 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3 ADOPTED |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-04-29 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 24, 2013, Upon Adjournment, Senate Lounge |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Monday, April 22, 2013 cancelled. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 22, 2013, Upon Evening Recess or Adjournment, Senate Lounge |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 42 |
2013-04-15 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |