MO HB363 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the per diem for street light maintenance district board members from $50 to $100 per meeting attendance
Title
Increases the per diem for street light maintenance district board members from $50 to $100 per meeting attendance
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Burns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB363&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0363I.PDF |