MO HB353 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the defined contribution plan for employees of certain higher education institutions
Title
Changes the laws regarding the defined contribution plan for employees of certain higher education institutions
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Leara [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred: Retirement(H) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB353&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0353I.htm |