MO HB344 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Local Government(H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred: Local Government(H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the location of public auctions in the City of St. Louis.
Title
Changes the laws regarding the location of public auctions in the City of St. Louis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB344&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0141H.01I.pdf |