MO HB336 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to employer liability for injuries from required immunizations
Title
Creates provisions relating to employer liability for injuries from required immunizations
Sponsors
Rep. Mitch Boggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-03-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2023-03-20 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |