MO HB301 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Motion withdrawn - motion to override Governor's veto withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding certain sexual offenses and sexually violent offenders and establishes a prisoner re-entry program for certain offenders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding certain sexual offenses and sexually violent offenders and establishes a prisoner re-entry program for certain offenders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-11HouseMotion withdrawn - motion to override Governor's veto withdrawn
2013-07-03HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2013-07-03HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2013-07-03HouseVetoed by Governor (G)
2013-05-22HouseDelivered to Governor
2013-05-22HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2013-05-22HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2013-05-17HouseEmergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 152
2013-05-17HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 150
2013-05-17HouseHouse Concurs (H) - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 153
2013-05-17SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS AS AMENDED
2013-05-17SenateEmergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 26 NOES: 6
2013-05-17SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 1 TO SA 4, SA 4AA, ADOPTED AYES: 28 NOES: 4
2013-05-17SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2013-05-17SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2013-05-15SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2013-04-24SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS
2013-04-15SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2013-04-11SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 15, 2013, UPON EVENING RECESS OR ADJOURNMENT, SENATE LOUNGE
2013-04-04SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2013-03-27HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2013-03-27HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154
2013-03-27HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2013-03-12HousePerfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
2013-03-04HouseRules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H)
2013-03-04HouseRules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2013-03-04HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2013-02-28HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2013-02-28HouseReported Do Pass by Consent (H)
2013-02-27HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2013-02-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2013-02-13HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2013-01-31HouseReferred: Special Standing Committee on Corrections(H)
2013-01-24HouseRead Second Time (H)
2013-01-23HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback