MO HB300 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Interscholastic Youth Sports Brain Injury Prevention Act which requires the Department of Health and Senior Services to develop guidelines on the risk of concussion and brain injury
Title
Establishes the Interscholastic Youth Sports Brain Injury Prevention Act which requires the Department of Health and Senior Services to develop guidelines on the risk of concussion and brain injury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-07-13 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-12 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-12 | House Concurs (H) | |
2011-05-11 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-05-11 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) | |
2011-05-11 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2011-05-10 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-05-10 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-05-09 | Executive Session Scheduled | |
2011-05-03 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-05-02 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-21 | Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Familiest (S) | |
2011-04-18 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-13 | Perfected (H) | |
2011-04-13 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-04-11 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - No Action Taken (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-09 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-03-09 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2011-01-26 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |