MO HB289 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H)
Pending: House Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H)
Pending: House Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health benefit plans to offer at least the same level of coverage provided by MO HealthNet
Title
Requires health benefit plans to offer at least the same level of coverage provided by MO HealthNet
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |