MO HB277 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an exemption from the motor fuel tax for motor fuel used in watercraft in this state
Title
Authorizes an exemption from the motor fuel tax for motor fuel used in watercraft in this state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2013-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB277&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0277I.htm |