MO HB2646 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates J. Rieger & Co. the official Kansas City whiskey of Missouri
Title
Designates J. Rieger & Co. the official Kansas City whiskey of Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2024-02-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |