MO HB259 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to sexual offenses
Title
Modifies provisions relating to sexual offenses
Sponsors
Rep. David Evans [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - House: HB 259 (HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: HB 259 (*HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 63 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - House - House: HB 259 (*HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 63 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-28 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-04-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Committed to: Legislative Review(H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |