MO HB2574 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to keeping records for the sale of certain materials
Title
Modifies provisions relating to keeping records for the sale of certain materials
Sponsors
Rep. Don Mayhew [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - House - House: HB 2574 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: HB 2574 General (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: HB 2574 General (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: HB 2574 General (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: HB 2574 General (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 26, 2022, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Second read and referred: Small Business and Industry(S) |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-04-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 129 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-04-13 | House | Re-Perfected (H) |
2022-04-13 | House | HS Adopted (H) |
2022-04-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-04-13 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-04-04 | House | HS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-04 | House | HS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-04-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | Committed to: Legislative Review(H) |
2022-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Adopted (H) - Adoption of HCS AYES: 136 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 3 |
2022-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Adopted (H) - Perfected AYES: 136 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2 |
2022-03-29 | House | Perfected (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-03-29 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |