MO HB255 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-05 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the resale of event tickets
Title
Changes the laws regarding the resale of event tickets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House: HB 255 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 121 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 255 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 106 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 255 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 53 N: 98 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 255 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 106 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 255 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 53 N: 98 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-03 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 5, 2017, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2017-03-28 | House | Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment(S) |
2017-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 121 NOES: 29 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-03-27 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-15 | House | Perfected (H) |
2017-03-15 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-03-15 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-03-15 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Innovation and Technology(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |