MO HB2433 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires long-term care facilities to have on staff one person trained in suicide assessment, treatment, and management
Title
Requires long-term care facilities to have on staff one person trained in suicide assessment, treatment, and management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-04-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-04-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-02-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |