MO HB2389 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Missouri Health Insurance Pool to establish a program to allow individuals to purchase supplemental health insurance coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorder
Title
Requires the Missouri Health Insurance Pool to establish a program to allow individuals to purchase supplemental health insurance coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorder
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-31 | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Health Insurance (H) | |
2010-03-29 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-03-25 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2389&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB2389I.htm |