MO HB228 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits recording of IEP or Section 504 meetings by a student's parent or legal guardian
Title
Permits recording of IEP or Section 504 meetings by a student's parent or legal guardian
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House: HB 228 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House: HB 228 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House: HB 228 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 26, 3:30 p.m. or upon conclusion of Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources, SCR 2 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 20, 1 p.m., Senate Lounge |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education(S) |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-03-24 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-24 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2021-02-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |