MO HB228 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Blue Alert System and the Blue Alert System Oversight Committee to assist in the identification and location of any person suspected of killing or seriously wounding a law enforcement officer

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Blue Alert System and the Blue Alert System Oversight Committee to assist in the identification and location of any person suspected of killing or seriously wounding a law enforcement officer

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-01HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2017-01-31HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-05HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-15HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback