MO HB2234 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires course materials and instruction relating to human sexuality and sexually transmitted diseases to contain information about sexual harassment, sexual violence, and consent
Title
Requires course materials and instruction relating to human sexuality and sexually transmitted diseases to contain information about sexual harassment, sexual violence, and consent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-05-07 | House | Placed Back on Perfection Calendar |
2018-05-02 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |