MO HB2218 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Municipal Land Reutilization Law
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Municipal Land Reutilization Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House: HB 2218 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 13 NV: 15 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 2, 2022, 1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-04-14 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 111 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 15 |
2022-04-14 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, adopted. |
2022-04-06 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-04-06 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |