MO HB2197 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a state agency to repeal two existing rules before enacting a new one
Title
Requires a state agency to repeal two existing rules before enacting a new one
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hudson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |