MO HB2161 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law regarding levee and drainage districts.
Title
Changes the law regarding levee and drainage districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Rone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2020-03-09 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2020-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2020-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2161&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4734H.01I.pdf |