MO HB2141 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Fresh Start Act of 2020.
Title
Establishes the Fresh Start Act of 2020.
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Grier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H) |
2020-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |