MO HB2085 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the associate circuit judge positions awarded to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County and the 38th Judicial Circuit based on the 2014 judicial weighted workload model
Title
Changes the associate circuit judge positions awarded to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County and the 38th Judicial Circuit based on the 2014 judicial weighted workload model
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - AMENDED, NOTE ROOM CHANGE, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - AMENDED, NOTE ROOM CHANGE, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 5, 2014, upon evening recess or adjournment, Senate Lounge |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 5, 2014, upon evening recess or adjournment, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 |
2014-04-24 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-04-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-03-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |