MO HB2081 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a pregnant woman may use deadly force if she reasonably believes that deadly force is necessary to protect her unborn child against death, serious physical injury, or any forcible felony
Title
Specifies that a pregnant woman may use deadly force if she reasonably believes that deadly force is necessary to protect her unborn child against death, serious physical injury, or any forcible felony
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-06-25 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-04-28 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 3 | |
2010-04-28 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-04-22 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-21 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-04-21 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-20 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 21, 2010, 2:00P.M.SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 2 | |
2010-04-20 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2010-04-15 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-04-15 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 131 NOES: 21 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-04-13 | Perfected (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-04-13 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-04-06 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-06 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-06 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-24 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-24 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-16 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |