MO HB2071 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding abortions and required tissue reports
Title
Changes the laws regarding abortions and required tissue reports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2016-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2071&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2071I.PDF |